NV AB196 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT making an appropriation to the Department of Education for incentives for teachers who currently teach at Title I schools and schools designated as underperforming; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation for incentives for teachers who currently teach at Title I schools and underperforming schools. (BDR S-144)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10AssemblyChapter 488.
2019-06-07AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateRead second time.
2019-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2019-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2019-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-06-01AssemblyTo printer.
2019-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 3, Vacant: 1.)
2019-06-01AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1079.)
2019-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback