NV AB196 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the collection of fines, administrative assessments and fees owed by certain convicted persons. (BDR 14-557)
Title
Revises provisions governing the collection of fines, administrative assessments and fees owed by certain convicted persons. (BDR 14-557)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203. | |
2011-05-28 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-27 | Senate Amendment No. 571 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 571.) To printer. | |
2011-05-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 204.) To printer. | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-15 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-02-22 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |