NV AB193 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208. (Effective July 1, 2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208. (Effective July 1, 2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; prohibiting a peace officer or other person authorized to conduct a custodial interrogation of a child from making certain statements during a custodial interrogation of a child; providing that a statement by a child obtained in violation of such a prohibition is presumed involuntary and inadmissible in any criminal or juvenile proceeding; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to custodial interrogations of children. (BDR 5-229)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208. (Effective July 1, 2024) |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 673 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 673.) To printer. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 260.) To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |