NV AB185 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health insurance; requiring the Board of the Public Employees' Benefits Program to conduct a study of the impact of using Medicare-based pricing for the health benefits of public employees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Providing for a study concerning certain health benefits. (BDR S-277)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 503.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |