NV AB175 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future AB175A
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes certain requirements for health benefits for the purpose of determining the minimum wage paid to employees in private employment in this State. (BDR 53-866)
Title
Prescribes certain requirements for health benefits for the purpose of determining the minimum wage paid to employees in private employment in this State. (BDR 53-866)
Sponsors
Rep. William McCurdy [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Sen. Chris Brooks [D] |
Rep. Olivia Diaz [D] | Rep. Amber Joiner [D] | Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 1098 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1098.) To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 903.) To printer. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 540.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |
Same As/Similar To
AB175 (Carry Over) 2017-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor.