NV AB175A | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Note: Carryover of previous AB175

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; prescribing certain requirements for health benefits for the purpose of determining the minimum wage paid to employees in private employment in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescribes certain requirements for health benefits for the purpose of determining the minimum wage paid to employees in private employment in this State. (BDR 53-866)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-02-06AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-02-06AssemblyBill read with Governor's veto message.
2019-02-04AssemblyMade Special Order of Business for Wednesday, February 6, 2019, at 11:45 a.m.
2019-02-04AssemblyReturned from Secretary of State.

Same As/Similar To

AB175 (Carry Over) 2017-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback