NV AB174 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 343.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to homelessness; establishing the Nevada Interagency Advisory Council on Homelessness to Housing; prescribing the membership and duties of the Council; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Nevada Interagency Advisory Council on Homelessness to Housing. (BDR 18-94)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyChapter 343.
2019-06-03AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-27AssemblySenate Amendment No. 760 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 760.) To printer.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-17AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 232.) To printer.
2019-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback