NV AB162 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pesticides; prohibiting the use of neonicotinoid pesticides for certain purposes; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions governing the use of neonicotinoid pesticides. (BDR 51-97)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 76. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 285.) To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |