NV AB16 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 230.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 230.
Summary
Provides for the disclosure of certain information to an emergency response employee concerning possible exposure to an infectious disease. (BDR 40-600)
Title
Provides for the disclosure of certain information to an emergency response employee concerning possible exposure to an infectious disease. (BDR 40-600)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 230. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendment No. 631 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 631.) To printer. | |
2009-05-11 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-08 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee. | |
2009-04-08 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 86.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-07 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=44 |