NV AB156 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child welfare; requiring a court to appoint an educational decision maker for a child for whom a petition is filed alleging that the child is in need of protection; prescribing the duties of such an educational decision maker; requiring an agency acting as the custodian of a child to include certain educational information in a report submitted to the court before a hearing to review the placement of the child; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the education of a child who is in need of protection. (BDR 38-458)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 53. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 221.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |