NV AB154 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to tissue donation; imposing certain requirements to ensure access to certain information concerning entities that accept living donations of birth tissue; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the regulation of the living donation of birth tissue. (BDR 40-455)
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peters [D] | Rep. David Orentlicher [D] | Rep. Natha Anderson [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] |
Rep. Venicia Considine [D] | Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 490.) To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |