NV AB152 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 110.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 110.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to historic preservation; revising and increasing the penalties for crimes related to certain actions which injure or destroy the cairn or grave of a native Indian or an historic or prehistoric site and crimes related to the trafficking of cultural property obtained from state land without a permit; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to cultural resources and certain grave sites. (BDR 33-868)
Sponsors
Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] | Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] | Rep. Heidi Swank [D] |
Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Chapter 110. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 519.) To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |