NV AB144 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to bidder preferences on state and local public works projects. (BDR 28-64)
Title
Makes various changes relating to bidder preferences on state and local public works projects. (BDR 28-64)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20. | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Amendment No. 51 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 51.) To printer. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-23 | Rereferred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To committee. | |
2011-02-23 | From committee: Rerefer to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-02-21 | In Senate. | |
2011-02-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-02-17 | Read second time. | |
2011-02-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-14 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |