NV AB140 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 231. (Effective June 8, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 231. (Effective June 8, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legal holidays; making Juneteenth Day a legal holiday in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes Juneteenth Day a legal holiday in this State. (BDR 19-63)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 231. (Effective June 8, 2023) |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2023-04-07 | Assembly | To committee. |
2023-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 35.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |