NV AB138 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing pupils. (BDR 34-113)
Title
Revises provisions governing pupils. (BDR 34-113)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132. | |
2011-05-27 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendment No. 620 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-23 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 620.) To printer. | |
2011-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | |
2011-04-19 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 68.) To printer. | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-11 | Taken from Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-28 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-02-14 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |