NV AB137 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to the insurance premium tax. (BDR 32-68)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the insurance premium tax. (BDR 32-68)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-20Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-26AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 2, Excused: 4.)
2017-04-14AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-14AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-13AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 163.) To printer.
2017-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-10AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.
2017-02-10AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback