NV AB137 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing programs of nutrition in public schools. (BDR 34-191)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing programs of nutrition in public schools. (BDR 34-191)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-16 Vetoed by the Governor.
2011-06-13 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-06-06 Senate Amendment No. 913 concurred in. To enrollment.
2011-06-05 In Assembly.
2011-06-05 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2011-06-04 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2011-06-04 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 913.) To printer.
2011-06-04 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-06-04 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-05-18 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2011-05-18 In Senate.
2011-05-16 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2011-05-16 Placed on General File.
2011-05-16 From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Do pass, as amended.
2011-04-18 Exemption effective.
2011-04-18 To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
2011-04-18 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-04-15 Notice of eligibility for exemption.
2011-04-15 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 184.) To printer.
2011-04-15 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-04-15 From Concurrent Committee on Education: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-02-14 From printer. To committees.
2011-02-11 Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback