NV AB132 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; prohibiting the denial of employment because of the presence of marijuana in a screening test taken by a prospective employee with certain exceptions; authorizing an employee to rebut the results of a screening test under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing employment practices. (BDR 53-29)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 858.) To printer.
2019-05-21SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 740.) To printer.
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 616.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback