NV AB132 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides immunity from civil liability to persons employed by an agency to provide personal care services in the home in certain circumstances. (BDR 40-151)
Title
Provides immunity from civil liability to persons employed by an agency to provide personal care services in the home in certain circumstances. (BDR 40-151)
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Andy Eisen [D] | Rep. Olivia Diaz [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] |
Sen. Marilyn Dondero Loop [D] | Rep. Andrew Martin [D] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 154.) To printer. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |