NV AB130 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to persons with disabilities; transferring the duties of the Aging and Disability Services Division of the Department of Health and Human Services relating to the Nevada ABLE Savings Program to the State Treasurer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Places the Nevada ABLE Savings Program entirely under the authority of the State Treasurer. (BDR 38-177)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23. |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |