NV AB129 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the statewide requirements for class-size reduction and authorizes the boards of trustees of school districts to establish pupil-teacher ratios for elementary schools. (BDR 34-639)
Title
Repeals the statewide requirements for class-size reduction and authorizes the boards of trustees of school districts to establish pupil-teacher ratios for elementary schools. (BDR 34-639)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-04-19 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-19 | To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-19 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 421.) To printer. | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-18 | From Concurrent Committee on Education: Amend, but without recommendation. | |
2011-04-15 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committees. | |
2011-02-07 | From printer. | |
2011-02-04 | Prefiled. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer. |