NV AB123 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the square dance as the official dance of the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-677)
Title
Designates the square dance as the official dance of the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-677)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |