NV AB114 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40.
Summary
Makes changes concerning compensation to victims of crime. (BDR 16-624)
Title
Makes changes concerning compensation to victims of crime. (BDR 16-624)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40. | |
2009-05-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-01 | Senate Amendment No. 561 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 561.) To printer. | |
2009-04-24 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-02-26 | In Senate. | |
2009-02-25 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-02-24 | Read second time. | |
2009-02-23 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2009-01-26 | From printer. | |
2009-01-23 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=256 |