NV AB112 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wildlife; defining the term wildlife for the purposes of wildlife crossings; creating the Wildlife Crossings Account in the State General Fund; requiring the Director of the Department of Transportation to administer the Account; requiring the Department of Transportation, in consultation with the Department of Wildlife, to develop and publish an inventory and list of certain projects relating to wildlife crossings; requiring the Director of the Department of Transportation to review the standards and specifications for the design and construction of highways in this State to determine the standards and specifications necessary for incorporating wildlife crossings and related highway features into the highways of this State; requiring the Department of Transportation and the Department of Wildlife to consult with certain persons regarding locations for wildlife crossings and related highway features; authorizing the Director of the Department of Transportation to adopt regulations; making an appropriation to implement projects relating to wildlife crossings; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions relating to wildlife crossings. (BDR 35-340)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) To printer. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-07 | Assembly | To committee. |
2023-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 31.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |