NM SM66 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study Wind Turbine Decommissioning
Title
Study Wind Turbine Decommissioning
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |