NM SM65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (43-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (43-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Connell's cabin as new mexico treasure
Title
Connell's cabin as new mexico treasure
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (43-0) Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |