NM SM59 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regional Dental School Study Group
Title
Regional Dental School Study Group
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC |