NM SM55 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Feb. 12 As "i Heart Caregivers Day"
Title
Feb. 12 As "i Heart Caregivers Day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (43-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Not Referred to Committee |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Not Printed |