NM SM5 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cyfd Restructuring Task Force
Title
Cyfd Restructuring Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2024-02-10 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-09 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SHPAC |