NM SM37 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Improvements To Indigent Care System
Title
Study Improvements To Indigent Care System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-07 | House | [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (32-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |