NM SM30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Research School Admin Expenditures
Title
Research School Admin Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |