NM SM101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expand radiation worker benefits
Title
Expand radiation worker benefits
Sponsors
Sen. John Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Passed Senate (29-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |