NM SJR5 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Failed passage in Senate (17-24).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Failed passage in Senate (17-24).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use & Tax Of Marijuana & Revenue , Ca
Title
Use & Tax Of Marijuana & Revenue , Ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Failed passage in Senate (17-24). |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |