NM SJR3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Fund Annual Distributions, Ca
Title
Permanent Fund Annual Distributions, Ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Education |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Assigned to House Education and then to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (23-19) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |