NM SJM29 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] HBIC- DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] HBIC- DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of elevator industry
Title
Regulation of elevator industry
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HBIC- DP API. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] PASSED/S (29-7) | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP/a | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP-SCORC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SRC/SCORC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=29&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM029.pdf |