NM SJM24 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] HEC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] HEC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study school district finances & operations
Title
Study school district finances & operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HEC API. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] PASSED/S (25-0) | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP/a-SEC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SRC/SEC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=24&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM024.pdf |