NM SJM2 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Missing & Murdered Indigenous Task Force
Title
Missing & Murdered Indigenous Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2024-02-09 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-07 | House | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SIRC |