NM SJM12 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
J. Paul Taylor, In Memory
Title
J. Paul Taylor, In Memory
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2023-02-24 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2023-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2023-02-22 | House | tabled temporarily by motion in House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:0 N:0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2023-02-21 | Senate | tabled temporarily by motion in Senate |