NM SJM1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fund Bureau Of Indian Education
Title
Fund Bureau Of Indian Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2021-03-08 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-25 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC |