NM SJM1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family-friendly workplace task force
Title
Family-friendly workplace task force
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (33-0) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |