NM SB99 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 72 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 72 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Diplomas For Vietnam Veterans
Title
Diplomas For Vietnam Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 72 - Mar. 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2020-02-19 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-16 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SEC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |