NM SB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 71 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 71 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Online School Budget Reporting
Title
Online School Budget Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 71 - Mar. 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-18 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2020-02-14 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SFC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |