NM SB94 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 124 - Apr. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 124 - Apr. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Athlete Endorsement Act
Title
Student Athlete Endorsement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 124 - Apr. 7 |
2021-03-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:21 |
2021-03-08 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-22 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HCEDC |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SJC |