NM SB94 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 9] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 67(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Obligation Bond Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Obligation Bond Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13Senate[LD 9] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 67(partial veto).
2018-02-13House[LD 9] Passed House (67-0)
2018-02-12House[LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-12House[LD 8] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2018-02-12House[LD 8] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (38-0)
2018-02-10Senate[LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-10Senate[LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted
2018-01-22Senate[LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-01-22Senate[LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2018-01-18Senate[LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2018-01-18Senate[LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Finance
2018-01-16Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback