NM SB94 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (54-12) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (54-12) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Industrial hemp farming act
Title
Industrial hemp farming act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (54-12) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] HAWC |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] HAWC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] HAWC |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] HAWC and then to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (33-8) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |