NM SB89 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - [LD 10] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - [LD 10] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Text messaging as careless driving
Title
Text messaging as careless driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP API. | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DNP-CS/DP-SJC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] germane-SPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SCC/SPAC/SJC-SCC |