NM SB86 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gold Star Family License Plate Eligibility
Title
Gold Star Family License Plate Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 7 |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (68-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |