NM SB86 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (59-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (59-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Rights Notices Posted Online
Title
Water Rights Notices Posted Online
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (59-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to HSIVC |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | Senate | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |