NM SB76 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Local Share Adjustment Waiver
Title
School Local Share Adjustment Waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Feb. 29 |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2024-02-13 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-07 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-05 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-18 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SFC |