NM SB76 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lead In Sale Of Recycled Metals Act
Title
Lead In Sale Of Recycled Metals Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 51 |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (59-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-01-22 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |